AZ HB2675 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Water conservation notice; no abandonment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water conservation notice; no abandonment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-09SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-05SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2020-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45188Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45189Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45189.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73354
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2675p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2675h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2675griffin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2675natural resources energy water.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73354&billStatusActionId=194002&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73354&billStatusActionId=194009&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback