AZ HB2675 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Food stamps; benefit cards; penalty
Title
Food stamps; benefit cards; penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-3-2-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (41-15-4-0) | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House read second time | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |