AZ HB2674 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; exceptions; guaranteed asset protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; exceptions; guaranteed asset protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateChapter 113
2019-04-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-15HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0)
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0)
2019-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72318
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2674p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2674h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0113.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72318&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72318&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72318&billStatusActionId=187373&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72318&billStatusActionId=187669&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72318&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72318&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72318&billStatusActionId=188681&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72318&billStatusActionId=188963&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback