AZ HB2674 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Central state repository; nonprofit organizations
Title
Central state repository; nonprofit organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (29-1-0-0) | |
2012-04-10 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-05 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Consent Calendar March 12, 2012 @ 1:20 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-5-3-0) | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-31 | House read second time | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in House and read first time |