AZ HB2664 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cannabis possession; school zones; definition
Title
Cannabis possession; school zones; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-16-2-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |