AZ HB2646 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
JTEDs; adult students
Title
JTEDs; adult students
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Ben Arredondo [D] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] |
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-13 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Consent Calendar April 04, 2011 @ 1:05 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (34-22-4-0) | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |