AZ HB2643 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; optometrists; contracts; covered services
Title
Insurance; optometrists; contracts; covered services
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1057.18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1342.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1402.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1404.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 849 | New Code | See Bill Text |