AZ HB2642 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; amendments
Title
Civil rights; amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1492.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |