AZ HB2639 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Timeshares; disclosures
Title
Timeshares; disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 245 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Discharged from Commmittee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2019-05-16 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-16 | House | Discharged from Commmittee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference members: UGENTI-RITA, LIVINGSTON, NAVARRETE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2019-04-29 | House | House Conference members: BOLICK, BLACKMAN, TERÁN |
2019-04-29 | House | House Conference appointed |
2019-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Attorney General
Contracts And Contractors
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purchase Agreements
Real Estate
Timeshares
Contracts And Contractors
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purchase Agreements
Real Estate
Timeshares
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2197.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2197.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |