AZ HB2636 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Flat income tax
Title
Flat income tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Hold | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Hold | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | House third reading , voting: (40-18-2-0) | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-03 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-1-2-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House read second time | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |