AZ HB2629 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; exemption; pacemakers
Title
TPT; exemption; pacemakers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-1-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |