AZ HB2627 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County transportation excise tax; transit
Title
County transportation excise tax; transit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | House final reading , voting: (41-18-1-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-11-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Consent Calendar April 19, 2010 @ 5:10 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | House third reading , voting: (38-19-2-0) | |
2010-03-01 | House Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 3:26 PM | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-22 | House NRRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |