AZ HB2626 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deeds of trust; foreclosure procedures
Title
Deeds of trust; foreclosure procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | House final reading , voting: (42-15-3-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-27 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-2-1-0) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (45-11-4-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in House and read first time |