AZ HB2618 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Decommissioning; solar and wind; standards
Title
Decommissioning; solar and wind; standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-19 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-06-13 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | House | House concurs |
2023-06-13 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-13 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2023-06-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-1-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Abandonment (s)
Applicability (s)
Certificate Of Insurance (s)
Cessation Of Use (s)
Conditions (s)
Cost Estimate (s)
Damage (s)
Decommissioning
Duty To Maintain (s)
Estimated Salvage Value (s)
Financial Assurance (s)
Liability Insurance (s)
Notice Of Cancellation (s)
Notification Requirements (s)
Power - Title 30
Required (s)
Site Restoration Plan (s)
Solar And Wind
Standards
Update (s)
Waiver (s)
Applicability (s)
Certificate Of Insurance (s)
Cessation Of Use (s)
Conditions (s)
Cost Estimate (s)
Damage (s)
Decommissioning
Duty To Maintain (s)
Estimated Salvage Value (s)
Financial Assurance (s)
Liability Insurance (s)
Notice Of Cancellation (s)
Notification Requirements (s)
Power - Title 30
Required (s)
Site Restoration Plan (s)
Solar And Wind
Standards
Update (s)
Waiver (s)