AZ HB2616 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mask mandates; minors; parental consent
Title
Mask mandates; minors; parental consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Chapter 184 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |