AZ HB2609 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Officeholder expense accounts; statewide; legislative
Title
Officeholder expense accounts; statewide; legislative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House final reading , voting: (51-6-3-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-26 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-2-2-0) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-2-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (52-2-6-0) | |
2010-03-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House and read first time |