AZ HB2596 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public land management; sovereign immunity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public land management; sovereign immunity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Governor Vetoed
2019-04-24 Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-23HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0)
2019-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-07HouseAssigned to House FR Committee
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12820.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72230
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2596p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2596h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72230&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72230&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72230&billStatusActionId=187426&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72230&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72230&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72230&billStatusActionId=188841&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72230&billStatusActionId=189087&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback