AZ HB2594 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco master settlement; sales data
Title
Tobacco master settlement; sales data
Sponsors
Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] |
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Chapter 301 | |
2016-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (36-18-6-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |