AZ HB2588 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State forester; legislative presentation; report
Title
State forester; legislative presentation; report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Department Of Forestry And Fire Management (dffm)
Legislative Presentation
Public Lands - Title 37
Report
State Forester
Legislative Presentation
Public Lands - Title 37
Report
State Forester
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |