AZ HB2588 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver licenses; foster youth
Title
Driver licenses; foster youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 374 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-17 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (43-16-1-0) |
2021-05-17 | House | House concurs |
2021-05-05 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-10-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Certificate Of Birth Registration (h)
Department Of Child Safety (h)
Driver Licenses
Foster Youth
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Department Of Child Safety (h)
Driver Licenses
Foster Youth
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 3160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |