AZ HB2587 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's declaration; fiscal impact analysis
Title
Governor's declaration; fiscal impact analysis
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-07-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |