AZ HB2587 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public records; point of contact
Title
Public records; point of contact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 142 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-2-4-0) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-1-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-4-1-0-0) |
2022-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Point Of Contact
Public Records
Public Records Requests (s)
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39
Requests (s)
Public Records
Public Records Requests (s)
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39
Requests (s)