AZ HB2587 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Livestock; animal cruelty; violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock; animal cruelty; violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-03-11SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-19SenateSenate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-4-0)
2014-03-12SenateReferred to Senate NRRA Committee
2014-03-12SenateSenate read second time
2014-03-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-11SenateAssigned to Senate NRRA Committee
2014-03-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-03-10HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-03-10HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0)
2014-03-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2014-03-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2014-02-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-11HouseHouse AW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0)
2014-02-11HouseReferred to House AW Committee
2014-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-10HouseAssigned to House AW Committee
2014-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=HB2587
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.2587-p1-barton.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2587-aw.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2587bb1.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.2587215.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.2587nrra.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587.haw.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2587.snrra.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback