AZ HB2579 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonwage compensation; minimum wage
Title
Nonwage compensation; minimum wage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 203 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (34-20-6-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |