AZ HB2578 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency executive powers; legislative oversight
Title
Emergency executive powers; legislative oversight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Emergency
Emergency Management
Executive Powers
Legislative Oversight
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Public Finances - Title 35
Repeal
Emergency Management
Executive Powers
Legislative Oversight
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Public Finances - Title 35
Repeal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 303 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |