AZ HB2575 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State grand juries; jurisdiction.
Title
State grand juries; jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Jack Brown [D] | Rep. Chad Campbell [D] | Rep. Chad Campbell [D] |
Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Rep. David Lujan [D] | Rep. Lucy Mason [R] |
Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Sen. David Schapira [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | House third reading , voting: (55-0-4-0) | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |