AZ HB2563 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Postsecondary institutions; free expression policies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary institutions; free expression policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateChapter 267
2018-04-25SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-19HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-19SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-04-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-16HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (34-23-3-0)
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conference adopted
2018-04-12HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2018-04-12SenateSenate Conference adopted
2018-04-12SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2018-04-10HouseHouse Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
2018-04-10SenateSenate Conference members: SMITH has been replaced by PETERSEN
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference members: PETERSEN, BROPHY MCGEE, MENDEZ
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Conference members: BOYER, ALSTON, NORGAARD
2018-04-05HouseHouse Conference appointed
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-03-27HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-26HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151864Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151866New CodeSee Bill Text
151867New CodeSee Bill Text
151868New CodeSee Bill Text
151869New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70802
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2563p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2563h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2563s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2563c.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0267.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2563boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2563education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25630242.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2563ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/2r/h.2563conference.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=181582&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=181641&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=182650&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=182664&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=183287&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70802&billStatusActionId=183348&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback