AZ HB2552 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor establishments; hours of operation
Title
Liquor establishments; hours of operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=HB2552 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/hb2552p.htm |