AZ HB2548 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public forums; activities; postsecondary campuses
Title
Public forums; activities; postsecondary campuses
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Chapter 249 | |
2016-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | House final reading , voting: (32-23-5-0) |
2016-05-07 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |