AZ HB2547 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting centers ban; precinct size
Title
Voting centers ban; precinct size
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-24-2-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Additional Acts (s)
Additional Unlawful Acts (s)
Appointment Of Election Boards (s)
Civil Penalties (s)
Classification (s)
Conduct Of Elections
Designation (s)
Early Ballot On-site Tabulation Procedure (s)
Early Ballots (s)
Election Day (s)
Election Precincts (s)
Electioneering (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Fund (s)
On-site Tabulation (s)
Polling Places (s)
Precinct Size
Qualifications (s)
Request For Ballot (s)
Respect To Voting (s)
Unlawful Acts (s)
Violation (s)
Voters (s)
Voting Centers Ban
Wait Times (s)
Additional Unlawful Acts (s)
Appointment Of Election Boards (s)
Civil Penalties (s)
Classification (s)
Conduct Of Elections
Designation (s)
Early Ballot On-site Tabulation Procedure (s)
Early Ballots (s)
Election Day (s)
Election Precincts (s)
Electioneering (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Fund (s)
On-site Tabulation (s)
Polling Places (s)
Precinct Size
Qualifications (s)
Request For Ballot (s)
Respect To Voting (s)
Unlawful Acts (s)
Violation (s)
Voters (s)
Voting Centers Ban
Wait Times (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 1018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |