AZ HB2547 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Racing commission; simulcasting; wagering facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racing commission; simulcasting; wagering facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 293
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (39-20-1-0)
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-15HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
2019-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate NRE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House FR Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411293New CodeSee Bill Text
413026.04New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71861
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2547p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2547h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2547s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0293.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.25470155.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2547nre.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2547floorborrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2547floorpratt2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=186770&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=186829&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=189597&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=189598&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=189772&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71861&billStatusActionId=189773&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback