AZ HB2532 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Critical health information; emergency responders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Critical health information; emergency responders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 292
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-23HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-15HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28678New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71753
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2532p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2532h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2532s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0292.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.25320903.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2532tps.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71753&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71753&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71753&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71753&billStatusActionId=187657&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71753&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71753&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71753&billStatusActionId=189431&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71753&billStatusActionId=189601&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71753&billStatusActionId=189889&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71753&billStatusActionId=189888&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback