AZ HB2529 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Scope of practice; process; repeal.
Title
Scope of practice; process; repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-06 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Replaced by) 2023-03-03 - Governor Vetoed
Subjects
Process
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulation Of Health Professionals
Repeal
Scope Of Practice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulation Of Health Professionals
Repeal
Scope Of Practice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3106 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |