AZ HB2527 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited laws, rules, ordinances; firearms
Title
Prohibited laws, rules, ordinances; firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Chapter 126 | |
2015-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-25 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |