AZ HB2519 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Supervision; physician assistants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supervision; physician assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
322501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71683
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2519p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2519h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2519barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2519health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71683&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71683&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71683&billStatusActionId=187039&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71683&billStatusActionId=187044&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71683&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71683&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71683&billStatusActionId=188703&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback