AZ HB2515 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Governor appointees; criminal records checks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor appointees; criminal records checks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 327
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-05-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0)
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
123151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
123152New CodeSee Bill Text
23422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
261026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
261067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321672Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
415353Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69531
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2515p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2515h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0327.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69531&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69531&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69531&billStatusActionId=175553&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69531&billStatusActionId=175440&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69531&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69531&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69531&billStatusActionId=177510&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69531&billStatusActionId=177542&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback