AZ HB2499 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain; existing contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; existing contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
2020-03-05SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2020-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73166
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2499p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2499h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73166&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73166&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73166&billStatusActionId=194011&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73166&billStatusActionId=194017&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73166&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73166&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback