AZ HB2499 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Per pupil funding calculation; JTEDs
Title
Per pupil funding calculation; JTEDs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | House | House final reading , voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |