AZ HB2498 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unmanned aircraft study committee
Title
Unmanned aircraft study committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |