AZ HB2495 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidated election dates; tax authorization
Title
Consolidated election dates; tax authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |