AZ HB2492 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
White Mountain Apache; settlement; appropriation
Title
White Mountain Apache; settlement; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-1-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |