AZ HB2487 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance carriers; subcontractor audits
Title
Insurance carriers; subcontractor audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-23-4-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House IR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |