AZ HB2483 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 258 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 258 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal population estimates; use
Title
Municipal population estimates; use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Chapter 258 E | |
2016-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-29 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |