AZ HB2482 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Foster care tuition waiver

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care tuition waiver

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151809.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70543
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2482p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2482h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.24821114.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2482ed.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70543&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70543&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70543&billStatusActionId=181364&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70543&billStatusActionId=181421&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70543&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70543&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70543&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback