AZ HB2481 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Short-term rentals; enforcement; penalties
Title
Short-term rentals; enforcement; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Enforcement
Penalties
Short-term Rental
Taxation - Title 42
Vacation And Short-term Rentals
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Enforcement
Penalties
Short-term Rental
Taxation - Title 42
Vacation And Short-term Rentals
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 269.17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1125.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 500.39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |