AZ HB2480 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (8-22-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (8-22-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Additional state aid; maximum amount
Title
Additional state aid; maximum amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (8-22-0-0) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-2-0-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |