AZ HB2475 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motorcycle operations; riding between lanes
Title
Motorcycle operations; riding between lanes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-29 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-8-3-0) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-26 | Senate Consent Calendar April 26, 2010 @ 4:36 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-27 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (54-0-6-0) | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-25 | House read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced in House and read first time |