AZ HB2473 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal speeding
Title
Criminal speeding
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Payne moved that HB 2473 be referred to an additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Payne moved that HB 2473 be referred to an additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Payne moved that HB 2473 be referred to an additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Payne moved that HB 2473 be referred to an additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-02-24 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (26-33-1-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |