AZ HB2471 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health care appeals; medications
Title
Insurance; health care appeals; medications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2542 | New Code | See Bill Text |