AZ HB2458 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County infill, renewable energy districts
Title
County infill, renewable energy districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (4-25-1-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | House third reading , voting: (41-16-3-0) | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | House Consent Calendar February 21, 2011 @ 4:21 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House ENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House ENR Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House ENR Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |